DC B24-0553 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-18 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-18 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 24-553 would require credit reporting agencies to accept a personal statement from a consumer indicating the consumer experienced financial hardship resulting from a public health emergency. It also precludes users of credit reports from considering adverse information in a report that was directly or indirectly the result of a public health emergency if the personal statement is included in the report.
Title
Public Health Emergency Credit Alert Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-18 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-09-23 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-09-21 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-12-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0553 Published in the DC Register |
2021-12-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2021-12-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B24-0553 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/48388/Introduction/B24-0553-Introduction.pdf |