DC B24-0543 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - Law L24-0101, Effective from Mar 15, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 002371, Expires on Oct 26, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - Law L24-0101, Effective from Mar 15, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 002371, Expires on Oct 26, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
District of Columbia Housing Authority Resident Commissioners Election Deadline Extension Temporary Amendment Act of 2021
Title
District of Columbia Housing Authority Resident Commissioners Election Deadline Extension Temporary Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-21 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-21 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-21 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-25 | Council | Law L24-0101, Effective from Mar 15, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 002371, Expires on Oct 26, 2022 |
2022-01-31 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2022-01-28 | Council | Act A24-0291 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 000597 |
2022-01-24 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-01-24 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0291 |
2022-01-07 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 24, 2022 |
2021-12-21 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-12-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0543 Published in the DC Register |
2021-12-07 | Council | Amendment (A. Bonds) |
2021-12-07 | Council | First Reading |
2021-12-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-12-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |