DC B24-0542 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-31 - Act A24-0252 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 014067, Expires on Mar 22, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-31 - Act A24-0252 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 014067, Expires on Mar 22, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
District of Columbia Housing Authority Resident Commissioners Election Deadline Extension Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Title
District of Columbia Housing Authority Resident Commissioners Election Deadline Extension Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-07 - Council - Amendment (A. Bonds) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - Amendment (A Bonds) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - Amendment (A Bonds) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-31 | Council | Act A24-0252 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 014067, Expires on Mar 22, 2022 |
2021-12-27 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-12-22 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0252, Expires on Mar 22, 2022 |
2021-12-15 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 30, 2021 |
2021-12-07 | Council | Oral amendment (A. Bonds) |
2021-12-07 | Council | Amendment (A. Bonds) |
2021-12-07 | Council | Final Reading |
2021-12-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-12-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |