DC B24-0541 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - Law L24-0100, Effective from Mar 15, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 002370, Expires on Oct 26, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - Law L24-0100, Effective from Mar 15, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 002370, Expires on Oct 26, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Department of Health Functions Clarification Temporary Amendment Act of 2021
Title
Department of Health Functions Clarification Temporary Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-21 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-21 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-21 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-25 | Council | Law L24-0100, Effective from Mar 15, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 002370, Expires on Oct 26, 2022 |
2022-01-31 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2022-01-28 | Council | Act A24-0290 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 000595 |
2022-01-24 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-01-24 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0290 |
2022-01-11 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 26, 2022 |
2021-12-21 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-12-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0541 Published in the DC Register |
2021-12-07 | Council | First Reading |
2021-12-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-12-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |