DC B24-0540 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-31 - Act A24-0251 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 014065, Expires on Mar 22, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-31 - Act A24-0251 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 014065, Expires on Mar 22, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Department of Health Functions Clarification Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Title
Department of Health Functions Clarification Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-31 | Council | Act A24-0251 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 014065, Expires on Mar 22, 2022 |
2021-12-27 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-12-22 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0251, Expires on Mar 22, 2022 |
2021-12-15 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 30, 2021 |
2021-12-07 | Council | Final Reading |
2021-12-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-12-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |