DC B24-0510 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-17 - Act A24-0238 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 013487, Expires on Mar 13, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-17 - Act A24-0238 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 013487, Expires on Mar 13, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
John Lewis Elementary School Designation Emergency Act of 2021
Title
John Lewis Elementary School Designation Emergency Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-16 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-16 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-16 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-17 | Council | Act A24-0238 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 013487, Expires on Mar 13, 2022 |
2021-12-13 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-12-13 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0238, Expires on Mar 13, 2022 |
2021-11-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 13, 2021 |
2021-11-16 | Council | Final Reading |
2021-11-16 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-11-15 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |