DC B24-0501 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-05 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 24-501 would ensure the Office of Contracting and Procurement’s retrospective analysis account for a period of additional emergency procurement authority during the COVID-19 public health emergency and the following review period, and also set an end date for emergency procurement authority related to the COVID-19 pandemic.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Analyzing Additional Emergency Procurement Activity Amendment Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-10-05CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2022-08-26CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2022-08-24CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-11-19CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B24-0501 Published in the DC Register
2021-11-16CouncilReferred to Committee on Government Operations and Facilities
2021-11-02CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback