DC B24-0489 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on November 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-10 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Mar 08, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on November 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-10 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Mar 08, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 24-489 would change presumptive eligibility for waiver of prepayment of court fees and costs to guaranteed eligibility for fee waivers and expand the category of litigants who are guaranteed fee waivers.
Title
Expanding Fee Waivers for Low-Income Litigants Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-18 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-04 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-04 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-10 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Mar 08, 2023 |
2022-12-02 | Council | Act A24-0641 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 014603 |
2022-11-21 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-11-21 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0641 |
2022-11-04 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 21, 2022 |
2022-10-18 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-10-04 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2022-09-20 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-09-16 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2022-09-16 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0489 |
2022-01-06 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-12-17 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-12-13 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-11-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0489 Published in the DC Register |
2021-11-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-10-27 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |