DC B24-0470 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-26 - Act A24-0210 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 012361, Expires on Feb 16, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Coronavirus Unemployment Compensation Provisions Sunset Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2021

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coronavirus Unemployment Compensation Provisions Sunset Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2021

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-11-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-26CouncilAct A24-0210 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 012361, Expires on Feb 16, 2022
2021-11-19CouncilReturned from Mayor
2021-11-18CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0210, Expires on Feb 16, 2022
2021-11-05CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 22, 2021
2021-11-02CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2021-11-02CouncilRetained by the Council
2021-11-01CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback