DC B24-0463 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-19 - Act A24-0205 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 012186, Expires on Feb 03, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Department of Insurance, Securities and Banking Emergency Powers Emergency Amendment Act of 2021

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Insurance, Securities and Banking Emergency Powers Emergency Amendment Act of 2021

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-11-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-19CouncilAct A24-0205 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 012186, Expires on Feb 03, 2022
2021-11-08CouncilReturned from Mayor
2021-11-05CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0205, Expires on Feb 03, 2022
2021-11-05CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 22, 2021
2021-11-02CouncilFinal Reading
2021-11-02CouncilRetained by the Council
2021-10-26CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback