DC B24-0462 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 26 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-09 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 24-462 would amend eligibility requirements for Grandparent Caregivers and Close Relative Caregivers Program. It would remove the requirement that caregivers demonstrate that they have been the child’s primary caregiver and resided with them for six months.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grandparent and Close Relative Caregivers Program Amendment Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-09CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2021-11-19CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-11-15CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-11-05CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B24-0462 Published in the DC Register
2021-11-02CouncilReferred to Committee on Human Services
2021-10-26CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback