DC B24-0457 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-07 - Law L24-0178, Effective from Sep 21, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 011948
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 24-457 would authorize remote online notarization both by use of secure electronic records and by use of paper documents signed in ink, notarized, and delivered to the parties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revised Uniform Law on Notarial Acts Amendment Act of 2021

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-07-12 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-12 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-10-07CouncilLaw L24-0178, Effective from Sep 21, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 011948
2022-08-09CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2022-08-05CouncilAct A24-0529 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 009927
2022-07-29CouncilReturned from Mayor
2022-07-27CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0529
2022-07-21CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 4, 2022
2022-07-12CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2022-06-28CouncilFirst Reading, CC
2022-06-27CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2022-06-13CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2022-06-13CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B24-0457
2022-06-08CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2022-03-07CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2022-02-18CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2022-02-09CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-11-05CouncilReferred to Committee on Housing and Executive Administration
2021-11-05CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B24-0457 Published in the DC Register
2021-11-02CouncilReferred to Committee on Housing and Executive Administration
2021-11-02CouncilReferred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2021-10-20CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback