DC B24-0454 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-22 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-22 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 24-454 would provide an economic recovery package for the Central Business District (CBD) including incentivizing mixed use conversions and new businesses to the CBD. It would also provide temporary tax relief for innovative businesses that locate in the CBD and meet hiring and economic inclusion requirements.
Title
Rediscover Equitable Central Occupancy Vitality and Encourage Resilient Yield (RECOVERY) Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-22 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-11-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-02 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-11-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2021-10-29 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0454 Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-18 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B24-0454 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/48077/Introduction/B24-0454-Introduction.pdf |