DC B24-0452 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on October 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 24-452 would provide a real property tax abatement to the redevelopment project located on Lots 835 and 840 in Square 5539 located on Branch Avenue, S.E. in Ward 7.
Title
Square 5539 Tax Abatement Act of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-02-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-02-02 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-11-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2021-10-29 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0452 Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-18 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B24-0452 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/48074/Introduction/B24-0452-Introduction.pdf |