DC B24-0433 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-28 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-28 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 24-433 would resize Residential Permit Parking (RPP) zones to align with Advisory Neighborhood Commission boundaries.
Title
Rightsizing Residential Permit Parking Regulation Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-28 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-10-28 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-10-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-10-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-07-29 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-07-26 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-22 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0433 Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2021-10-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B24-0433 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/47989/Introduction/B24-0433-Introduction.pdf |