DC B24-0425 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on November 29 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-04 - Law L24-0065, Effective from Feb 18, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 001682, Expires on Oct 01, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on November 29 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-04 - Law L24-0065, Effective from Feb 18, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 001682, Expires on Oct 01, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Council Vaccination Policy Enforcement Temporary Amendment Act of 2021
Title
Council Vaccination Policy Enforcement Temporary Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-02 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Council | Law L24-0065, Effective from Feb 18, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 001682, Expires on Oct 01, 2022 |
2022-01-06 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2021-12-17 | Council | Act A24-0243 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 013509 |
2021-12-14 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A24-0243 |
2021-12-13 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-11-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 13, 2021 |
2021-11-02 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson) |
2021-11-02 | Council | Final Reading |
2021-10-19 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-10-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0425 Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-05 | Council | First Reading |
2021-10-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |