DC B24-0423 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on January 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Law L24-0085, Effective from Mar 02, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 002029
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on January 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Law L24-0085, Effective from Mar 02, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 002029
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 24-423 would require all eligible school students and employees of licensed child development facilities in the District to be vaccinated against COVID-19, with an allowable religious or medical exemption. It also allows for the electronic submission of certification of all required childhood immunizations.
Title
Coronavirus Immunization of School Students and Early Childhood Workers Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Cnc. Christina Henderson [I] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] |
Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Janeese Lewis George [D] | Cnc. Brooke Pinto [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-21 - Council - Amendment (P. Mendelson) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-21 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-21 - Council - Amendment (P. Mendelson) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-21 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-21 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-21 - Council - Amendment (P. Mendelson) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-21 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | Council | Law L24-0085, Effective from Mar 02, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 002029 |
2022-01-21 | Council | Act A24-0285 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 000440 |
2022-01-18 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2022-01-12 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-01-12 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0285 |
2021-12-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 13, 2022 |
2021-12-21 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2021-12-21 | Council | Amendment (P. Mendelson) |
2021-12-21 | Council | Final Reading |
2021-12-07 | Council | First Reading |
2021-12-07 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0423 |
2021-10-27 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-10-27 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-10-08 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0423 Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2021-10-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |