DC B24-0422 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-06 - Law L24-0209, Effective from Dec 21, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 000005
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-06 - Law L24-0209, Effective from Dec 21, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 000005
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Torres Strait Way Designation Act of 2021
Title
Torres Strait Way Designation Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-04 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-06 | Council | Law L24-0209, Effective from Dec 21, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 000005 |
2022-11-11 | Council | Act A24-0605 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 013946 |
2022-11-07 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2022-11-01 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-10-31 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0605 |
2022-10-17 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 31, 2022 |
2022-10-04 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-10-03 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-09-20 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2022-09-20 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2022-09-20 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0422 |
2022-07-06 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-06-17 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-06-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0422 Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2021-10-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |