DC B24-0415 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Enrolled on November 29 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - Law L24-0064, Effective from Feb 18, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 001681, Expires on Oct 01, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Public Service Commission Member Qualifications Temporary Amendment Act of 2021

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Service Commission Member Qualifications Temporary Amendment Act of 2021

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-11-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-04CouncilLaw L24-0064, Effective from Feb 18, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 001681, Expires on Oct 01, 2022
2022-01-06CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2021-12-17CouncilAct A24-0242 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 013507
2021-12-14CouncilEnacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A24-0242
2021-12-13CouncilReturned from Mayor
2021-11-29CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 13, 2021
2021-11-02CouncilFinal Reading
2021-10-05CouncilFirst Reading
2021-10-05CouncilRetained by the Council
2021-10-04CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback