DC B24-0414 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Enrolled on October 18 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-05 - Act A24-0203 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 011648, Expires on Jan 30, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on October 18 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-05 - Act A24-0203 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 011648, Expires on Jan 30, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public Service Commission Member Qualifications Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Title
Public Service Commission Member Qualifications Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Brooke Pinto [D] | Cnc. Janeese Lewis George [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] |
Roll Calls
2021-10-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-05 | Council | Act A24-0203 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 011648, Expires on Jan 30, 2022 |
2021-11-01 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-11-01 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A24-0203, Expires on Jan 30, 2022 |
2021-10-18 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 1, 2021 |
2021-10-05 | Council | Final Reading |
2021-10-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-10-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |