DC B24-0410 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-23 - Law L24-0151, Effective from Aug 16, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 011398
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-23 - Law L24-0151, Effective from Aug 16, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 011398
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 24-410 authorizes the Department of Energy and Environment to issue rules that establish flood hazard locations and require flood insurance as a condition of a certificate of occupancy for new or substantially improved buildings in flood hazard locations.
Title
Flood Resilience Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-23 | Council | Law L24-0151, Effective from Aug 16, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 011398 |
2022-07-05 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2022-07-01 | Council | Act A24-0442 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 007728 |
2022-06-28 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-06-28 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0442 |
2022-06-13 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on June 28, 2022 |
2022-06-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-05-03 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2022-04-07 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-04-06 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0410 |
2022-04-06 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-04-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-01-10 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-12-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-12-17 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-12-17 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-12-17 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-12-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-11-26 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-11-23 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-11-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-11-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-11-01 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-28 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0410 Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2021-10-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |