DC B24-0405 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - Law L24-0061, Effective from Feb 18, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 001678, Expires on Oct 01, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

COVID Vaccination Leave Temporary Amendment Act of 2021

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COVID Vaccination Leave Temporary Amendment Act of 2021

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-12-07 - Council - Amendment (E Silverman) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - Amendment (Silverman) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Silverman) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-04CouncilLaw L24-0061, Effective from Feb 18, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 001678, Expires on Oct 01, 2022
2022-01-06CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2021-12-31CouncilAct A24-0255 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 014074
2021-12-27CouncilReturned from Mayor
2021-12-22CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0255
2021-12-15CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 30, 2021
2021-12-07CouncilAmendment (Silverman)
2021-12-07CouncilFinal Reading
2021-11-05CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B24-0405 Published in the DC Register
2021-11-02CouncilAmendment (Silverman)
2021-11-02CouncilAmendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Silverman)
2021-11-02CouncilFirst Reading
2021-10-05CouncilRetained by the Council
2021-10-04CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback