DC B24-0404 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on November 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-26 - Act A24-0209 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 012355, Expires on Feb 03, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on November 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-26 - Act A24-0209 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 012355, Expires on Feb 03, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
COVID Vaccination Leave Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Title
COVID Vaccination Leave Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Janeese Lewis George [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] |
Roll Calls
2021-11-02 - Council - Amendment (Silverman) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Silverman) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - Amendment (Silverman) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Silverman) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Silverman) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - Amendment (Silverman) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Silverman) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-26 | Council | Act A24-0209 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 012355, Expires on Feb 03, 2022 |
2021-11-19 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-11-18 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0209, Expires on Feb 03, 2022 |
2021-11-05 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 22, 2021 |
2021-11-02 | Council | Amendment (Silverman) |
2021-11-02 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Silverman) |
2021-11-02 | Council | Final Reading |
2021-10-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-10-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |