DC B24-0396 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Mar 08, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Medical Marijuana Plant Count Elimination Temporary Amendment Act of 2021

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical Marijuana Plant Count Elimination Temporary Amendment Act of 2021

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-11-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-18CouncilTransmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Mar 08, 2022
2021-11-26CouncilAct A24-0218 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 012380
2021-11-19CouncilReturned from Mayor
2021-11-18CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0218
2021-11-05CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 22, 2021
2021-11-02CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2021-10-08CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B24-0396 Published in the DC Register
2021-10-05CouncilFirst Reading
2021-10-05CouncilRetained by the Council
2021-10-04CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback