DC B24-0379 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on November 5 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-11-30 - Transmitted to Congress
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Metropolitan Police Department Overtime Spending Accountability Temporary Act of 2021

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Metropolitan Police Department Overtime Spending Accountability Temporary Act of 2021

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-11-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-30CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2021-11-26CouncilAct A24-0219 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 012382
2021-11-23CouncilEnacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A24-0219
2021-11-19CouncilReturned from Mayor
2021-11-05CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 22, 2021
2021-11-02CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2021-10-08CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B24-0379 Published in the DC Register
2021-10-05CouncilFirst Reading
2021-10-05CouncilRetained by the Council
2021-10-01CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback