DC B24-0372 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on July 14 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-11-18 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 24-372 would introduce ranked choice voting to the District of Columbia for the 2024 elections, which would include a public education campaign about the transition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voter Ownership, Integrity, Choice, and Equity (VOICE) Amendment Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-18CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2021-09-17CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-09-09CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-08-13CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B24-0372 Published in the DC Register
2021-08-10CouncilReferred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2021-07-14CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback