DC B24-0371 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Independent 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Law L24-0074, Effective from Feb 24, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 002018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Independent 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Law L24-0074, Effective from Feb 24, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 002018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 24-371 restates the existing ward boundaries.
Title
Ward Redistricting Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-21 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-12-21 - Council - Amendment (T. White) (Y: 1 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-12-21 - Council - Amendment (McDuffie) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-21 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-21 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-12-21 - Council - Amendment (T. White) (Y: 1 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-12-21 - Council - Amendment (K. McDuffie) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-21 - Council - Amendment (P. Mendelson) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-21 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-21 - Council - Amendment (T. White) (Y: 1 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-12-21 - Council - Amendment (McDuffie) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-21 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-21 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-12-21 - Council - Amendment (T. White) (Y: 1 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-12-21 - Council - Amendment (K. McDuffie) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-21 - Council - Amendment (P. Mendelson) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-21 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | Council | Law L24-0074, Effective from Feb 24, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 002018 |
2022-01-11 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2022-01-07 | Council | Act A24-0265 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 000010 |
2021-12-29 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-12-29 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0265 |
2021-12-28 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 12, 2022 |
2021-12-21 | Council | Final Reading |
2021-12-21 | Council | Amendment (T. White) |
2021-12-21 | Council | Amendment (McDuffie) |
2021-12-21 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson) |
2021-12-07 | Council | First Reading |
2021-12-07 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0371 |
2021-12-06 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2021-11-19 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0371 |
2021-11-19 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-11-16 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-11-05 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-11-03 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2021-10-29 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2021-10-28 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2021-10-25 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2021-10-23 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2021-10-22 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2021-10-22 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-22 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-22 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-22 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-22 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-22 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-20 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2021-10-19 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-18 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2021-10-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-08 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-09-29 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-09-29 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-09-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-09-22 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-09-03 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-09-01 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-08-13 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0371 Published in the DC Register |
2021-08-10 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2021-07-13 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |