DC B24-0366 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-10 - Act A24-0166 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 009483, Expires on Nov 30, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-10 - Act A24-0166 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 009483, Expires on Nov 30, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Uniform Emergency Volunteer Health Practitioners Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Title
Uniform Emergency Volunteer Health Practitioners Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-10 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-10 - Council - Amendment (Gray) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-10 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-10 - Council - Amendment (Gray) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-10 - Council - Amendment (Gray) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-10 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-10 - Council - Amendment (Gray) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-10 | Council | Act A24-0166 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 009483, Expires on Nov 30, 2021 |
2021-09-01 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-09-01 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0166, Expires on Nov 30, 2021 |
2021-08-18 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on September 1, 2021 |
2021-08-10 | Council | Final Reading |
2021-08-10 | Council | Amendment (Gray) |
2021-08-10 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-08-05 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |