DC B24-0365 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-14 - Law L24-0049, Effective from Dec 29, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 000180, Expires on Aug 11, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Coronavirus Unemployment Compensation Provisions Sunset Temporary Amendment Act of 2021

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coronavirus Unemployment Compensation Provisions Sunset Temporary Amendment Act of 2021

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-10-05 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-03 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-14CouncilLaw L24-0049, Effective from Dec 29, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 000180, Expires on Aug 11, 2022
2021-11-15CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2021-11-05CouncilAct A24-0200 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 011638
2021-11-01CouncilReturned from Mayor
2021-11-01CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0200
2021-10-18CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 1, 2021
2021-10-05CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2021-10-05CouncilRetained by the Council
2021-08-06CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B24-0365 Published in the DC Register
2021-08-03CouncilFirst Reading
2021-08-02CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback