DC B24-0364 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-05 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-05 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Coronavirus Unemployment Compensation Provisions Sunset Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Title
Coronavirus Unemployment Compensation Provisions Sunset Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-03 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-03 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-03 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-08-27 | Council | Act A24-0163 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 008847, Expires on Nov 21, 2021 |
2021-08-23 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-08-23 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0163, Expires on Nov 21, 2021 |
2021-08-09 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 23, 2021 |
2021-08-03 | Council | Final Reading |
2021-08-03 | Council | (Amendment) McDuffie - Withdrawn |
2021-08-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |