DC B24-0361 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-19 - Law L24-0044, Effective from Nov 03, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 012185, Expires on Jun 16, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-19 - Law L24-0044, Effective from Nov 03, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 012185, Expires on Jun 16, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fiscal Year 2021 Revised Local Budget Second COVID Relief Temporary Act of 2021
Title
Fiscal Year 2021 Revised Local Budget Second COVID Relief Temporary Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-03 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-03 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-08-03 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-03 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-07-20 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-07-20 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-20 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-07-20 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-08-03 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-08-03 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-03 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-07-20 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-07-20 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-20 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-07-20 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-19 | Council | Law L24-0044, Effective from Nov 03, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 012185, Expires on Jun 16, 2022 |
2021-10-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-09-21 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2021-09-17 | Council | Act A24-0172 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 009690 |
2021-09-14 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-09-13 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0172 |
2021-09-02 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on September 17, 2021 |
2021-08-03 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) |
2021-08-03 | Council | Final Reading |
2021-07-23 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0361 Published in the DC Register |
2021-07-20 | Council | First Reading |
2021-07-20 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) |
2021-07-14 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |