DC B24-0357 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 22 2022 - 75% progression
Action: 2022-06-22 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 7, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 24-357 would include all consumer debt under the District’s collection law and prohibit deceptive behavior and certain threats from debt collectors. It would prohibit the communication of consumer indebtedness to employers friends or neighbors with a few exceptions. It establishes requirements for debt collectors initiating a cause of action against a consumer for consumer debt. It allows for the collection of damages and other fees to a consumer for a violation of this bill. Among other things it prohibits imprisonment or jailing of consumers for failure to pay consumer debt and establishes debt collection protections during a public health emergency declared by the Mayor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting Consumers from Unjust Debt Collection Practices Amendment Act of 2021

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-06-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-06-22CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 7, 2022
2022-06-07CouncilFinal Reading
2022-06-07CouncilAmendment (Mendelson)
2022-05-03CouncilFirst Reading
2022-05-03CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2022-04-05CouncilPostponed to Next Meeting
2022-03-15CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B24-0357
2021-11-30CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2021-11-29CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2021-10-08CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-10-08CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-10-05CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-09-30CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-07-16CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B24-0357 Published in the DC Register
2021-07-13CouncilReferred to Committee on Committee of the Whole
2021-07-12CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback