DC B24-0336 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-06 - Law L24-0207, Effective from Dec 21, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 000003
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-06 - Law L24-0207, Effective from Dec 21, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 000003
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, Bill 24-336 would designate the public alley system within Square 441, bounded by Wiltberger Street, N.W., T Street, N.W., T Street, N.W., Florida Avenue, N.W., 6th Street, N.W., and S Street, N.W. in Ward 6, as Holzbeirlein Bakery Way, Joe and Mae Hurd All Sports club Way, and Wiltberger Club House Way.
Title
Wiltberger East Alleys Designation Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-04 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-06 | Council | Law L24-0207, Effective from Dec 21, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 000003 |
2022-11-11 | Council | Act A24-0603 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 013942 |
2022-11-07 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2022-11-01 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-10-31 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0603 |
2022-10-17 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 31, 2022 |
2022-10-04 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-10-03 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-09-20 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0336 |
2022-09-20 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2022-09-20 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2021-11-03 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-11-03 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-09-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-09-22 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-09-17 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-09-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-07-16 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0336 Published in the DC Register |
2021-07-13 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2021-06-28 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |