DC B24-0333 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-13 - Act A24-0153 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 008002, Expires on Nov 03, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-13 - Act A24-0153 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 008002, Expires on Nov 03, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modification Nos. 1 and 2 to Contract No. DCAM-20-CS-RFQ-0002A with AAA Complete Building Services, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2021
Title
Modification Nos. 1 and 2 to Contract No. DCAM-20-CS-RFQ-0002A with AAA Complete Building Services, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-13 | Council | Act A24-0153 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 008002, Expires on Nov 03, 2021 |
2021-08-06 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-08-05 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0153, Expires on Nov 03, 2021 |
2021-07-23 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 6, 2021 |
2021-06-29 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-06-29 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-06-23 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |