DC B24-0326 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Act A24-0135 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 007684, Expires on Oct 27, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Act A24-0135 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 007684, Expires on Oct 27, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifications to Contract No. CW87285 with Standard Insurance Company Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2021
Title
Modifications to Contract No. CW87285 with Standard Insurance Company Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-06 | Council | Act A24-0135 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 007684, Expires on Oct 27, 2021 |
2021-07-29 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-07-29 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0135, Expires on Oct 27, 2021 |
2021-07-15 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 29, 2021 |
2021-06-29 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-06-29 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-06-21 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |