DC B24-0318 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Act A24-0118 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 007323, Expires on Oct 19, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Act A24-0118 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 007323, Expires on Oct 19, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Local Business Enterprise Clarification Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Title
Local Business Enterprise Clarification Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-30 | Council | Act A24-0118 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 007323, Expires on Oct 19, 2021 |
2021-07-21 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-07-21 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0118, Expires on Oct 19, 2021 |
2021-07-07 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 21, 2021 |
2021-06-29 | Council | Final Reading |
2021-06-29 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-06-28 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |