DC B24-0317 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Law L24-0034, Effective from Sep 22, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 010528, Expires on May 05, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Law L24-0034, Effective from Sep 22, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 010528, Expires on May 05, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Student Activity Fund Theatrical and Music Performance Expenditures Temporary Act of 2021
Title
Student Activity Fund Theatrical and Music Performance Expenditures Temporary Act of 2021
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-07-13 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-07-13 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-07-13 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-08 | Council | Law L24-0034, Effective from Sep 22, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 010528, Expires on May 05, 2022 |
2021-08-13 | Council | Act A24-0146 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 007985 |
2021-08-10 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2021-08-06 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-08-05 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0146 |
2021-07-23 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 6, 2021 |
2021-07-13 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-07-02 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0317 Published in the DC Register |
2021-06-29 | Council | First Reading |
2021-06-29 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-06-28 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |