DC B24-0308 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Law L24-0030, Effective from Sep 22, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 010524, Expires on May 05, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Law L24-0030, Effective from Sep 22, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 010524, Expires on May 05, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Good Faith Waiver of Certificate of Need for Healthcare Providers Temporary Amendment Act of 2021
Title
Good Faith Waiver of Certificate of Need for Healthcare Providers Temporary Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-13 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-07-13 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-07-13 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-08 | Council | Law L24-0030, Effective from Sep 22, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 010524, Expires on May 05, 2022 |
2021-08-13 | Council | Act A24-0143 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 007979 |
2021-08-10 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2021-08-06 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-08-05 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0143 |
2021-07-23 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 6, 2021 |
2021-07-13 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-07-02 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0308 Published in the DC Register |
2021-06-29 | Council | First Reading |
2021-06-29 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-06-24 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |