DC B24-0307 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Act A24-0116 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 007319, Expires on Oct 19, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Act A24-0116 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 007319, Expires on Oct 19, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Good Faith Waiver of Certificate of Need for Healthcare Providers Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Title
Good Faith Waiver of Certificate of Need for Healthcare Providers Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-30 | Council | Act A24-0116 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 007319, Expires on Oct 19, 2021 |
2021-07-21 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-07-21 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0116, Expires on Oct 19, 2021 |
2021-07-07 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 21, 2021 |
2021-06-29 | Council | Final Reading |
2021-06-29 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-06-24 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |