DC B24-0306 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on June 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-21 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-21 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill 24-306 would make any interrogation of a person under 18 years of age by law enforcement, during a custodial interrogation, inadmissible in court unless given a reasonable opportunity to confer with an attorney. It also prohibits consent searches if the subject of the search is under 18 years of age.
Title
Youth Rights Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Brooke Pinto [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Christina Henderson [I] | Cnc. Janeese Lewis George [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-21 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-08-27 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-08-20 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-06-18 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0306 Published in the DC Register |
2021-06-15 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-06-14 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B24-0306 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/47384/Introduction/B24-0306-Introduction.pdf |