DC B24-0305 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-21 - Committee Mark-up of B24-0305
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-21 - Committee Mark-up of B24-0305
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill 24-305 would require professional employer organizations that offer health insurance in the District to register with the Department of Insurance, Securities, and Banking. It also authorizes the Mayor to collect registration fees, impose fines, and suspend and revoke certificates of registration.
Title
Professional Employer Organization Registration Act of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-21 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0305 |
2022-11-18 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2022-03-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-03-07 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-03-07 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-03-07 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-03-07 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-03-07 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-03-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-03-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-02-28 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-02-18 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-02-11 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-12-17 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-12-15 | Council | Public Hearing Cancelled |
2021-12-14 | Council | Cancellation Notice of Public Hearing Filed |
2021-12-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-11-15 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-10-22 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-09-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-09-22 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-06-18 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0305 Published in the DC Register |
2021-06-15 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2021-06-11 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B24-0305 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/47383/Introduction/B24-0305-Introduction.pdf |