DC B24-0302 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-05 - Law L24-0144, Effective from Jul 22, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 009775
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 24-302 makes clarifying changes to the definitions of abandoned and dangerous vehicles. It also removes imprisonment as a possible sentence for leaving an abandoned or dangerous vehicle in public space.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Removal and Disposition of Abandoned and Other Unlawfully Parked Vehicles Reform Amendment Act of 2021

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-03 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Council - Amendment (Cheh and L.George) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-08-05CouncilLaw L24-0144, Effective from Jul 22, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 009775
2022-06-08CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2022-06-03CouncilAct A24-0435 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 006261
2022-05-24CouncilReturned from Mayor
2022-05-23CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0435
2022-05-16CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 31, 2022
2022-05-03CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2022-04-05CouncilAmendment (Cheh and L.George)
2022-04-05CouncilFirst Reading
2022-03-16CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2022-03-15CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B24-0302
2021-10-26CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2021-09-10CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-09-02CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-06-18CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B24-0302 Published in the DC Register
2021-06-15CouncilReferred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
2021-06-10CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback