DC B24-0294 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 2 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-11-02 - First Reading, CC
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, Bill 24-294 authorizes the Mayor to dispose of real property located at 2330 Pomeroy Road, S.E., Washington, DC, commonly known as the Wilkinson School.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wilkinson School Disposition Authorization Act of 2021

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-11-02 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-02CouncilFirst Reading, CC
2021-10-25CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2021-10-20CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2021-10-20CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B24-0294
2021-10-19CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2021-10-14CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B24-0294
2021-09-28CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-07-12CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2021-06-28CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-06-25CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-06-18CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B24-0294 Published in the DC Register
2021-06-15CouncilReferred to Committee on Government Operations and Facilities
2021-06-07CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback