DC B24-0292 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Act A24-0115 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 007317, Expires on Oct 19, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Act A24-0115 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 007317, Expires on Oct 19, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Contract No. NFPHC-NSD-21-C-00027 Modifications between the Not-for-Profit Hospital Corporation and Maxim Healthcare Staffing Services, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Title
Contract No. NFPHC-NSD-21-C-00027 Modifications between the Not-for-Profit Hospital Corporation and Maxim Healthcare Staffing Services, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-30 | Council | Act A24-0115 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 007317, Expires on Oct 19, 2021 |
2021-07-21 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-07-21 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0115, Expires on Oct 19, 2021 |
2021-07-07 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 21, 2021 |
2021-06-29 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-06-15 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-06-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |