DC B24-0289 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-13 - Act A24-0151 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 007998, Expires on Nov 03, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-13 - Act A24-0151 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 007998, Expires on Nov 03, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modification Nos. 11 and 12 to Contract No. CW63336 with Adrian L. Merton, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2021
Title
Modification Nos. 11 and 12 to Contract No. CW63336 with Adrian L. Merton, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-13 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-07-13 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-07-13 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-13 | Council | Act A24-0151 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 007998, Expires on Nov 03, 2021 |
2021-08-06 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-08-05 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0151, Expires on Nov 03, 2021 |
2021-07-23 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 6, 2021 |
2021-07-13 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-06-15 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-06-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |