DC B24-0281 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-17 - Act A24-0175 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 009732, Expires on Dec 12, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-17 - Act A24-0175 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 009732, Expires on Dec 12, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fiscal Year 2022 Local Budget Emergency Act of 2021
Title
Fiscal Year 2022 Local Budget Emergency Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-03 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-03 - Council - Amendment (Silverman) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-03 - Council - Amendment (Lewis George) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-03 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-03 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-03 - Council - Amendment (Silverman) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-03 - Council - Amendment (Lewis George) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-03 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-03 - Council - Amendment (Silverman) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-03 - Council - Amendment (Lewis George) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-03 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-03 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-03 - Council - Amendment (Silverman) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-03 - Council - Amendment (Lewis George) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-03 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-17 | Council | Act A24-0175 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 009732, Expires on Dec 12, 2021 |
2021-09-14 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-09-13 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0175, Expires on Dec 12, 2021 |
2021-09-02 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on September 17, 2021 |
2021-08-03 | Council | Final Reading |
2021-08-03 | Council | Amendment (Silverman) |
2021-08-03 | Council | Amendment (Lewis George) |
2021-08-03 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) |
2021-06-01 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-05-27 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |