DC B24-0278 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Law L24-0029, Effective from Sep 22, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 010523, Expires on May 05, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Law L24-0029, Effective from Sep 22, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 010523, Expires on May 05, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fiscal Year 2021 Revised Local Budget Advance School Payment Temporary Amendment Act of 2021
Title
Fiscal Year 2021 Revised Local Budget Advance School Payment Temporary Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-15 - Council - First Reading (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-15 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Council - First Reading (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-15 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-15 - Council - First Reading (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-15 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Council - First Reading (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-15 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-08 | Council | Law L24-0029, Effective from Sep 22, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 010523, Expires on May 05, 2022 |
2021-08-10 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2021-08-06 | Council | Act A24-0142 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 007698 |
2021-07-29 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-07-29 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0142 |
2021-07-15 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 29, 2021 |
2021-06-29 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-06-18 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0278 Published in the DC Register |
2021-06-15 | Council | First Reading |
2021-06-15 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) |
2021-06-01 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-05-27 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |