DC B24-0272 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Act A24-0106 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 006463, Expires on Sep 15, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Act A24-0106 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 006463, Expires on Sep 15, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modification Nos. 4 and 5 to Contract No. DCAM-17-CS-0033E with Keystone Plus Construction Corporation Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2021
Title
Modification Nos. 4 and 5 to Contract No. DCAM-17-CS-0033E with Keystone Plus Construction Corporation Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-25 | Council | Act A24-0106 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 006463, Expires on Sep 15, 2021 |
2021-06-22 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-06-17 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0106, Expires on Sep 15, 2021 |
2021-06-08 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on June 22, 2021 |
2021-06-01 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-06-01 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-05-24 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |