DC B24-0254 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-21 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-21 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, Bill 24-254 would require local education agencies to maintain data on school-based disciplinary actions involving law enforcement. MPD would be required to report school-involved incidents bi-annually.
Title
School Police Incident Oversight and Accountability Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Cnc. Christina Henderson [I] | Cnc. Brooke Pinto [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Janeese Lewis George [D] |
Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-21 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-08-27 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-08-20 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-06-01 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-05-28 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0254 Published in the DC Register |
2021-05-20 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B24-0254 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/47231/Introduction/B24-0254-Introduction.pdf |