DC B24-0248 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Act A24-0079 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 005600, Expires on Aug 17, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Act A24-0079 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 005600, Expires on Aug 17, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Coronavirus Public Health Extension Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Title
Coronavirus Public Health Extension Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-18 - Council - Amendment (Gray) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Council - Amendment (R White and Cheh) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Council - Amendment (Allen, Silverman, Lewis George, R. White, Nadeau) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-18 - Council - Amendment (Gray) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Council - Amendment (R White) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Council - Amendment (Allen) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Council - Amendment (Gray) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Council - Amendment (R White and Cheh) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Council - Amendment (Allen, Silverman, Lewis George, R. White, Nadeau) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-18 - Council - Amendment (Gray) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Council - Amendment (R White) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Council - Amendment (Allen) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Council | Act A24-0079 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 005600, Expires on Aug 17, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-05-19 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0079, Expires on Aug 17, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on June 3, 2021 |
2021-05-18 | Council | Final Reading |
2021-05-18 | Council | Amendment (Gray) |
2021-05-18 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson) |
2021-05-18 | Council | Amendment (R White and Cheh) |
2021-05-18 | Council | Amendment (Allen, Silverman, Lewis George, R. White, Nadeau) |
2021-05-18 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-05-17 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |